NJ S2125 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1507
Note: Carry Foward to future S1503
Note: Carry Over of previous S3578
Note: Carry Over of previous A3520
Note: Carry Foward to future S1503
Note: Carry Over of previous S3578
Note: Carry Over of previous A3520
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits chair or booth rentals for the purpose of providing cosmetology and hairstyling services or ancillary services.
Title
Permits chair or booth rentals for the purpose of providing cosmetology and hairstyling services or ancillary services.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2125 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2125 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1750 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S3578 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3520 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2125 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1750 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S3578 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3520 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2125 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2125_I1.HTM |