NJ S2130 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A793
Note: Carry Foward to future S1427
Note: Carry Foward to future S1752
Note: Carry Over of previous A4412
Note: Carry Over of previous S2993
Note: Carry Foward to future S1427
Note: Carry Foward to future S1752
Note: Carry Over of previous A4412
Note: Carry Over of previous S2993
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Gill)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Gill)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates "Community Wealth Preservation Program"; expands access for certain buyers to purchase property from sheriff's sales.
Title
Creates "Community Wealth Preservation Program"; expands access for certain buyers to purchase property from sheriff's sales.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Gill) |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2130 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Gill)
S2130 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Gill)
S2130 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Gill)
A1834 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4412 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2993 (Carry Over) 2018-09-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S2130 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Gill)
S2130 (Carry Over) 2021-12-02 - Senate Amendment (25-0) (Gill)
A1834 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4412 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2993 (Carry Over) 2018-09-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee