NJ S2137 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A3686 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Substituted by A3686 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Workplace Democracy Enhancement Act."
Title
"Workplace Democracy Enhancement Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Substituted by A3686 (1R) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (28-0) (Sweeney) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3686 (Same As) 2018-05-18 - Approved P.L.2018, c.15.