NJ S2165 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A261
Note: Carry Foward to future S2158
Note: Carry Over of previous A5419
Note: Carry Over of previous S3848
Note: Carry Foward to future S2158
Note: Carry Over of previous A5419
Note: Carry Over of previous S3848
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that in certain cases vacancy in membership of board of education of limited purpose regional school district will be filled by majority vote of board of education of constituent district represented by former board member.
Title
Provides that in certain cases vacancy in membership of board of education of limited purpose regional school district will be filled by majority vote of board of education of constituent district represented by former board member.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2165 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2165 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A333 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5419 (Carry Over) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3848 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2165 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A333 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5419 (Carry Over) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3848 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2165 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2165_I1.HTM |