NJ S2168 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S334
Note: Carry Over of previous A4030
Note: Carry Over of previous A4030
Note: Carry Over of previous A4030
Note: Carry Over of previous A4030
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Substituted by A1657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Substituted by A1657
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "breakfast after the bell" incentive fund.
Title
Establishes "breakfast after the bell" incentive fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-20 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A1657 |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2168 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Substituted by A1657
A1657 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A4030 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4030 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A1657 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A4030 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4030 (Carry Over) 2016-06-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee