NJ S2178 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S490
Note: Carry Over of previous A1864
Note: Carry Over of previous A1864
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Approved P.L.2020, c.99.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Approved P.L.2020, c.99.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals family cap in Work First New Jersey program.
Title
Repeals family cap in Work First New Jersey program.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3292 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2020, c.99. |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (56-18-4) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A3292 (1R) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-14) |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3292 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2178 (1R)
S490 (Carry Over) 2018-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A1864 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S490 (Carry Over) 2018-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A1864 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee