NJ S2192 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1010
Note: Carry Over of previous A2801
Note: Carry Over of previous A2801
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires 60 day notice concerning tuition rate changes by licensed child care centers.
Title
Requires 60 day notice concerning tuition rate changes by licensed child care centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1010 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2801 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A1844 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
A2801 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A1844 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2192 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2192_I1.HTM |