NJ S2197 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4092
Note: Carry Over of previous A4930
Note: Carry Over of previous A4930
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes disabled veteran tenant gross income tax credit.
Title
Establishes disabled veteran tenant gross income tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2197 (Carry Over) 2018-09-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2674 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A4930 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A2674 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A4930 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee