NJ S2209 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A3601 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A3601 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns regulation of guaranteed asset protection waivers by DOBI.
Title
Concerns regulation of guaranteed asset protection waivers by DOBI.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Substituted by A3601 (2R) |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3601 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.82.