NJ S2228 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2865
Note: Carry Foward to future S2007
Note: Carry Over of previous S1968
Note: Carry Foward to future S2007
Note: Carry Over of previous S1968
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Recovery Tax Credit Program"; incentivizes hiring and continued employment of certain individuals in recovery from substance use disorder.
Title
Establishes "Recovery Tax Credit Program"; incentivizes hiring and continued employment of certain individuals in recovery from substance use disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2228 (Carry Over) 2022-06-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2228 (Carry Over) 2022-06-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1968 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3682 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2228 (Carry Over) 2022-06-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1968 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3682 (Same As) 2022-06-09 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee