NJ S2242 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1617
Note: Carry Over of previous A3016
Note: Carry Over of previous S289
Note: Carry Over of previous A3016
Note: Carry Over of previous S289
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Commissioner of Education to encourage implementation of Natural High Drug Prevention Program in school districts.
Title
Directs Commissioner of Education to encourage implementation of Natural High Drug Prevention Program in school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2242 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3325 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3016 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S289 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A3325 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3016 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S289 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2242 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2242_I1.HTM |