NJ S2354 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Vetoed on December 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-17 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-17 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits cancellation or nonrenewal of insurance policies and insurance premium finance agreements for a period of at least 60 days under certain circumstances after declaration of public health emergency, or state of emergency, or both.
Title
Prohibits cancellation or nonrenewal of insurance policies and insurance premium finance agreements for a period of at least 60 days under certain circumstances after declaration of public health emergency, or state of emergency, or both.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3920 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3920 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | Senate | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (40-0) (Greenstein) |
2020-12-17 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (40-0) |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A3920 (2R) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2020-04-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
A3920 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2354 (2R)