NJ S236 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2834
Note: Carry Over of previous A4902
Note: Carry Over of previous A4902
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires commercial Internet websites and online services to notify customers of collection and disclosure of personally identifiable information and allows customers to opt out.
Title
Requires commercial Internet websites and online services to notify customers of collection and disclosure of personally identifiable information and allows customers to opt out.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2834 (Carry Over) 2018-07-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2188 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A4902 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2188 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A4902 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S236 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/236_I1.HTM |