NJ S236 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3194
Note: Carry Over of previous S2897
Note: Carry Over of previous A4657
Note: Carry Over of previous S2897
Note: Carry Over of previous A4657
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Sally's Law"; establishes testing and visitation requirements and employment restrictions for long-term care facilities in response to outbreaks of infectious disease.
Title
"Sally's Law"; establishes testing and visitation requirements and employment restrictions for long-term care facilities in response to outbreaks of infectious disease.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S236 (Carry Over) 2023-06-27 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2897 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4657 (Carry Over) 2020-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
A358 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2897 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4657 (Carry Over) 2020-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
A358 (Same As) 2022-09-15 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S236 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/236_I1.HTM |