NJ S2371 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4145
Note: Carry Over of previous S2127
Note: Carry Over of previous S2127
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases mandatory minimum term of imprisonment for certain repeat sex offenders.
Title
Increases mandatory minimum term of imprisonment for certain repeat sex offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2739 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4145 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S2127 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4145 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S2127 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2371 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2371_I1.HTM |