NJ S2386 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1511
Note: Carry Foward to future S939
Note: Carry Over of previous A5453
Note: Carry Over of previous S3568
Note: Carry Foward to future S939
Note: Carry Over of previous A5453
Note: Carry Over of previous S3568
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Secretary of State to establish election incident reporting and complaint database; requires certain telephone numbers be provided with voter instructions.
Title
Directs Secretary of State to establish election incident reporting and complaint database; requires certain telephone numbers be provided with voter instructions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2386 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2386 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A779 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5453 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3568 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2386 (Carry Over) 2022-03-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A779 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5453 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3568 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2386 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2386_I1.HTM |