NJ S2390 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5195
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State and private correctional facilities to allow inmates to make telephone and video calls at no cost to inmate or other party.
Title
Requires State and private correctional facilities to allow inmates to make telephone and video calls at no cost to inmate or other party.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1889 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
A5195 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A5195 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2390 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2390_I1.HTM |