NJ S2429 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1558
Note: Carry Foward to future A3444
Note: Carry Foward to future A3444
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires automobile insurers to disclose policy limits upon request by an attorney under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires automobile insurers to disclose policy limits upon request by an attorney under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4028 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4028 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-12) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-6-3) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4028 (1R) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-9) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2429 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S2429 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4028 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2429 (1R)
S2429 (Carry Over) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
A4028 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S2429 (1R)