NJ S2476 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.55.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, c.55.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns certain workers' compensation supplemental benefits for surviving dependents of essential employees who die in course of employment.
Title
Concerns certain workers' compensation supplemental benefits for surviving dependents of essential employees who die in course of employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 12 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3998 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3998 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.55. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-12-3) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted for A3998 |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-1) |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3998 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S2476