NJ S2484 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOE to conduct study on options and benefits of instituting later school start time in middle school and high school.
Title
Requires DOE to conduct study on options and benefits of instituting later school start time in middle school and high school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3845 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3845 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3845 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.96. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A3845 |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3845 (Same As) 2015-06-11 - Substituted by S2484