NJ S2491 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A4019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-13 - Substituted by A4019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits eligible students who are members of United States Armed Forces to wear military uniform at high school graduation.
Title
Permits eligible students who are members of United States Armed Forces to wear military uniform at high school graduation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4019 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4019 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.84.