NJ S2503 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A2581
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A2581
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain cosmetology and hairstyling courses may be taught using distance learning technology.
Title
Provides that certain cosmetology and hairstyling courses may be taught using distance learning technology.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | Substituted by A2581 |
2023-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2581 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.301.