NJ S2517 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Approved P.L.2020, c.114.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-30 - Approved P.L.2020, c.114.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes program to adopt paratransit best practices, requires greater coordination among paratransit service providers, and establishes regional paratransit coordinating councils.
Title
Establishes program to adopt paratransit best practices, requires greater coordination among paratransit service providers, and establishes regional paratransit coordinating councils.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4208 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4208 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.114. |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4208 (1R) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Benson) |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4208 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2517 (1R)