NJ S2526 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S554
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.92.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on January 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.92.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portion of Interstate Highway Route 195 in Upper Freehold Township as "State Trooper Anthony A. Raspa Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates portion of Interstate Highway Route 195 in Upper Freehold Township as "State Trooper Anthony A. Raspa Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4105 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.92. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A4105 |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2526 (Carry Over) 2017-01-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.92.
A4105 (Same As) 2016-11-21 - Substituted by S2526
A4105 (Same As) 2016-11-21 - Substituted by S2526