NJ S2578 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.65.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Approved P.L.2015, c.65.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes optometrists to continue prescribing medications containing hydrocodone.
Title
Authorizes optometrists to continue prescribing medications containing hydrocodone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3922 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3922 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3922 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.65. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-1-2) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Substituted for A3922 |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3922 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Substituted by S2578