NJ S2603 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2430
Note: Carry Over of previous S1315
Note: Carry Over of previous S1315
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides awarding of contracts for professional services by State, county, municipal, and school district through competitive contracting process.
Title
Provides awarding of contracts for professional services by State, county, municipal, and school district through competitive contracting process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A869 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2430 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1315 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2430 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1315 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2603 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2603_I1.HTM |