NJ S262 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S2589
Note: Carry Foward to future A3866
Note: Carry Over of previous S1486
Note: Carry Over of previous A3210
Note: Carry Foward to future A3866
Note: Carry Over of previous S1486
Note: Carry Over of previous A3210
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets States mileage reimbursement rate at IRS rate for business use of automobile.
Title
Sets States mileage reimbursement rate at IRS rate for business use of automobile.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S262 (Carry Over) 2023-06-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S262 (Carry Over) 2023-06-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1486 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3210 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2294 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5680 (Same As) 2023-06-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S262 (Carry Over) 2023-06-12 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1486 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3210 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2294 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5680 (Same As) 2023-06-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee