NJ S2620 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S769
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires four-year institutions of higher education to offer accelerated three-year baccalaureate degree programs.
Title
Requires four-year institutions of higher education to offer accelerated three-year baccalaureate degree programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2620 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee