NJ S2624 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S870
Note: Carry Foward to future A3636
Note: Carry Foward to future A3636
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Dual Enrollment Study Commission.*
Title
Establishes Dual Enrollment Study Commission.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2624 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2624 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4682 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S2624 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4682 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee