NJ S2636 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs NJTA to reduce tolls no longer required for payment of Access to the Region's Core Tunnel project.
Title
Directs NJTA to reduce tolls no longer required for payment of Access to the Region's Core Tunnel project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Passed by the Senate (26-9) | |
2011-01-20 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3736 (Same As) 2011-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee