NJ S264 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2143
Note: Carry Foward to future S1493
Note: Carry Over of previous S1878
Note: Carry Over of previous A4541
Note: Carry Over of previous S182
Note: Carry Over of previous A570
Note: Carry Foward to future S1493
Note: Carry Over of previous S1878
Note: Carry Over of previous A4541
Note: Carry Over of previous S182
Note: Carry Over of previous A570
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-5)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates smoking ban exemption for casinos and simulcasting facilities.
Title
Eliminates smoking ban exemption for casinos and simulcasting facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S264 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S264 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1878 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4541 (Carry Over) 2020-08-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2151 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S182 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A570 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S264 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1878 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4541 (Carry Over) 2020-08-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2151 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S182 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A570 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S264 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/264_I1.HTM |