NJ S2644 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1755
Note: Carry Over of previous S684
Note: Carry Over of previous A3875
Note: Carry Over of previous S684
Note: Carry Over of previous A3875
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-04 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-04 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows public libraries, boards of education, and local governments to dispose of certain personal property without advertising for bids.
Title
Allows public libraries, boards of education, and local governments to dispose of certain personal property without advertising for bids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1180 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1180 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-1-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A1180 (1R) |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2644 (Carry Over) 2022-01-04 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A1180 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S2644 (1R)
S684 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3875 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1180 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S2644 (1R)
S684 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3875 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee