NJ S265 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S314
Note: Carry Over of previous S202
Note: Carry Over of previous S202
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State reimbursement to municipalities of cost of disabled veterans' total property tax exemption.
Title
Requires State reimbursement to municipalities of cost of disabled veterans' total property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. James Holzapfel [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S265 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S202 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3703 (Same As) 2016-05-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S202 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A3703 (Same As) 2016-05-19 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S265 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S0500/265_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S265 |