NJ S265 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1494
Note: Carry Over of previous S2399
Note: Carry Over of previous A436
Note: Carry Over of previous S2399
Note: Carry Over of previous A436
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A1226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A1226
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric public utilities to provide priority power restoration to certain medical facilities, assisted living facilities, and nursing homes.
Title
Requires electric public utilities to provide priority power restoration to certain medical facilities, assisted living facilities, and nursing homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A1226 |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S265 (Carry Over) 2021-01-11 - Substituted by A1226
S2399 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1226 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.29.
A436 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S2399 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A1226 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.29.
A436 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S265 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/265_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S265 |