NJ S2657 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Substituted by A4033
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-12-11 - Substituted by A4033
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends deadline for completion of school district's annual audit.
Title
Extends deadline for completion of school district's annual audit.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-27 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Senate | Substituted by A4033 |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4033 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0)