NJ S2689 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S165
Note: Carry Foward to future A4130
Note: Carry Foward to future A4130
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-27 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-06-27 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands definition of child under PFRS and SPRS.
Title
Expands definition of child under PFRS and SPRS.
Sponsors
Sen. Vincent Polistina [R] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Jean Stanfield [R] | Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2689 (Carry Over) 2023-06-27 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2689 (Carry Over) 2023-06-27 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4022 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2689 (Carry Over) 2023-06-27 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4022 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee