NJ S2691 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portion of U.S. Route 1 in South Brunswick Township as "Pleasant T. Macon Highway."
Title
Designates portion of U.S. Route 1 in South Brunswick Township as "Pleasant T. Macon Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Passed by the Senate (34-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3793 (Same As) 2011-02-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation, Public Works and Independent Authorities Committee