NJ S2707 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.107.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.107.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes task force within DOE on prevention of sexual abuse of children.
Title
Establishes task force within DOE on prevention of sexual abuse of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4403 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.107. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted for A4403 (1R) |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Ruiz) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4403 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2707 (2R)