NJ S2707 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1345
Note: Carry Foward to future S1035
Note: Carry Over of previous S3635
Note: Carry Over of previous A5406
Note: Carry Foward to future S1035
Note: Carry Over of previous S3635
Note: Carry Over of previous A5406
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases qualified research expenses tax credit for corporation business taxpayers engaged in targeted industries; increases basic research payment tax credit; allows research tax credit to be refundable.
Title
Increases qualified research expenses tax credit for corporation business taxpayers engaged in targeted industries; increases basic research payment tax credit; allows research tax credit to be refundable.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-12-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2707 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2707 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3635 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5406 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A2487 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S2707 (Carry Over) 2022-12-19 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3635 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5406 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A2487 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee