NJ S2723 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1476
Note: Carry Over of previous S930
Note: Carry Over of previous S930
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain motor vehicles that are owned by certain nutrition programs and certain nonprofit organizations that offer social services from motor vehicle registration fees.
Title
Exempts certain motor vehicles that are owned by certain nutrition programs and certain nonprofit organizations that offer social services from motor vehicle registration fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A112 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A1476 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S930 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A1476 (1R)
A1476 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S930 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A1476 (1R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2723 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2723_I1.HTM |