NJ S2741 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A4189 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A4189 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies short-time unemployment benefit law.
Title
Modifies short-time unemployment benefit law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4189 (2R) |
2013-11-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Bucco) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4189 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.279.