NJ S2758 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.136.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.136.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increases financial resources provided through Medicaid program for certain hospitals; Establishes County Option Hospital Fee Pilot Program.
Title
Increases financial resources provided through Medicaid program for certain hospitals; Establishes County Option Hospital Fee Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4212 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4212 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.136. |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-28-1) |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-12) |
2018-09-27 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (23-15) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-26-3) |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4212 |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-16) |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4212 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by S2758