NJ S2777 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2106
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Substituted by A1628 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Substituted by A1628 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies DEP's New Jersey Recycling Awards Program to annually recognize outstanding recycling achievements.
Title
Codifies DEP's New Jersey Recycling Awards Program to annually recognize outstanding recycling achievements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | Senate | Substituted by A1628 (1R) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1628 (Same As) 2017-03-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.33.
A2106 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A2106 (Carry Over) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee