NJ S2779 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A954
Note: Carry Over of previous S2225
Note: Carry Over of previous S2225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes reimbursement for EMT training from EMT Training Fund for certain volunteer firefighters.
Title
Authorizes reimbursement for EMT training from EMT Training Fund for certain volunteer firefighters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1090 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee
A954 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S2225 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A954 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S2225 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2779 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2779_I1.HTM |