NJ S2782 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJTA and SJTA to provide electric vehicle recharging stations at certain rest areas on New Jersey Turnpike, Garden State Parkway, and Atlantic City Expressway.*
Title
Requires NJTA and SJTA to provide electric vehicle recharging stations at certain rest areas on New Jersey Turnpike, Garden State Parkway, and Atlantic City Expressway.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-08-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-3) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1728 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Passed by the Assembly (44-27-2)