NJ S2787 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A3944 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A3944 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Commissioner of NJDOT to procure revenue-generating sponsors for, and permit sponsorship acknowledgment and advertising on, safety and emergency service patrol vehicles and equipment.
Title
Authorizes Commissioner of NJDOT to procure revenue-generating sponsors for, and permit sponsorship acknowledgment and advertising on, safety and emergency service patrol vehicles and equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Substituted by A3944 (1R) | |
2011-06-27 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-06-02 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3944 (Same As) 2011-09-16 - Approved P.L.2011, c.133.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S2787 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S3000/2787_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S3000/2787_R1.HTM |