NJ S2789 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4173
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits 16 and 17-year-olds to vote in elections for local school board.
Title
Permits 16 and 17-year-olds to vote in elections for local school board.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4173 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4369 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4369 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2789 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2789_I1.HTM |