NJ S279 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1104
Note: Carry Foward to future A2956
Note: Carry Foward to future S987
Note: Carry Over of previous S4180
Note: Carry Foward to future A2956
Note: Carry Foward to future S987
Note: Carry Over of previous S4180
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements and process for temporary courtesy licenses and certificates issued by State Board of Examiners, NJ Board of Nursing, and other professional and occupational licensing boards to nonresident military spouses.
Title
Revises requirements and process for temporary courtesy licenses and certificates issued by State Board of Examiners, NJ Board of Nursing, and other professional and occupational licensing boards to nonresident military spouses.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-22 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S279 (Carry Over) 2020-10-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S279 (Carry Over) 2020-10-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S279 (Carry Over) 2020-10-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S4180 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3184 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S279 (Carry Over) 2020-10-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S279 (Carry Over) 2020-10-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S4180 (Carry Over) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3184 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S279 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S0500/279_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S279 |