NJ S2792 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3063
Note: Carry Over of previous A3063
Note: Carry Over of previous A3063
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A2087 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A2087 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants drivers additional time to resolve parking violations prior to license or registration suspension.
Title
Grants drivers additional time to resolve parking violations prior to license or registration suspension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted by A2087 (1R) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2087 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.75.
A3063 (Carry Over) 2014-03-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3063 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
A3063 (Carry Over) 2014-03-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3063 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee