NJ S2797 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3846
Note: Carry Over of previous S2670
Note: Carry Over of previous S2670
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows small private theater used for musical or theatrical performances to acquire alcoholic beverage retail license.
Title
Allows small private theater used for musical or theatrical performances to acquire alcoholic beverage retail license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2872 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
A3846 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S2670 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3846 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S2670 (Carry Over) 2022-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2797 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2797_I1.HTM |